U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huffman, Jr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 04, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Expedite ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2021: [Order of Competency to Stand Trial ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.