U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Todd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel on Appeal - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 02, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.