U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement (Applicable Party) - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 16, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Vacate]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Letter - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.