U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Driscoll
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.