U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nestegard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 05, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2021: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.