U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 07, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.