U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lindsay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 12, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • May 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Vacate]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.