U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lapier et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Exhibits Returned/Disposed - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 01, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Suppress ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.