U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Koop et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Bond Hearing - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Quash ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Revoke]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Vacate]
  • September 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.