U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hovey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 12, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • May 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 31, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued (Sealed) - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.