U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Estate of Edward R. Champion v. Billings Skilled Nursing Facility, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Stay]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Remand]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 16, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.