U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00054
  • Case Name: BNSF Railway Company v Rod
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Transfer - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Transfer - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.