U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00087
  • Case Name: In Re Friedt
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.