U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Evenson-Childs v. Ravalli County Sheriff's Office
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 09, 2022: [Vacate]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Certify Class - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 18, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • November 10, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 22, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 10, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 09, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.