U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Morales v. Warden of Montana State Prison
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 19, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.