U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:19-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cossette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence ]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Reduce Sentence]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order to Locate Counsel - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.