U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Eagle Bear Inc. et al v. The Blackfeet Indian Nation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [USCA Order - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Response - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2022: [Withdraw Reference]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 27, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Vacate]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: [Remark]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 10, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 10, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.