U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Stillsmoking v. Smail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 11, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.