U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 16, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • January 07, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.