U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Runs Above
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 29, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 08, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.