U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Server
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.