U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05114-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Saha
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Issue of Summons]
  • October 06, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 22, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • September 14, 2021: [Appear]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.