U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Pickett et al v. Mountain West Federal Credit Union et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Settlement Conference - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2021: [Vacate]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 30, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 02, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 13, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.