U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Thommen v. James Hardie Building Products Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 20, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • October 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 13, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 13, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.