U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Wittine v. Sgt. Riley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 03, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • August 13, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • August 13, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.