U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Montana Environmental Information Center v. United States Bureau of Land Management
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Remark]
  • December 27, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Statement - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 13, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 13, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.