U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00066-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.