U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Henderson v. Salmonson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 16, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.