U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Moser v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • June 13, 2022: [Remand]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Administrative Record]
  • March 23, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 16, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.