U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:05-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ulmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • February 23, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 16, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.