U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Aills v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 06, 2021: [Withdraw]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.