U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lockhart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Stipulation - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2021: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 17, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 17, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.