U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abresch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.