U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stevens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.