U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pando
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.