U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Chattin v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 06, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 19, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.