U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Newbary et al v. Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Remark]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Remand]
  • August 25, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.