U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Avista Corporation et al v. NorthWestern Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Remark]
  • September 08, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.