U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stevens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.