U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Divis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.