U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baumann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.