U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bezjon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Vacate]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 22, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.