U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • March 28, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.