U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nohrenberg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 05, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.