U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seadeer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.