U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 13, 2022: [3731 Certification]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Staying Case - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.