U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schlichting et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 31, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 31, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 11, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 26, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.