U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loves Him
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Prob/SR (Form 34 and 35) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2022: [Vacate]
  • April 06, 2022: [Dismiss ]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.