U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00024-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Sherman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.