U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Pacificsource Health Plans v. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
  • July 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Set Aside Default]
  • May 23, 2022: [Application for Taxation of Costs - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • May 16, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Default Judgment - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 30, 2021: [Entry of Default]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 23, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.